+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Approval memo.16
- Signed chap.553
On December 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading cal.455
- Substituted for s3753a
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed assembly
- Delivered to senate
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.293
- Rules report cal.293
- Reported
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 740a
- Amend and recommit to codes
On February 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to agriculture
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor