+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.663
On December 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.950
- Substituted For S6158
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On May 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.315
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
June 5, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor