+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6587
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.238
- Rules Report Cal.238
- Reported
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor