+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6294a
- Rules Report Cal.474
- Reported
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7381a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Rules
On May 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To People With Disabilities