+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to energy
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 7351a
- Vote reconsidered - restored to third reading
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Recalled from senate
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed assembly
- Delivered to senate
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to finance
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Delivered to senate
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to finance
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.159
- Rules report cal.159
- Reported
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to energy
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor