+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Vote reconsidered - restored to third reading
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Recalled from senate
- Recommitted to ways and means
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to local government
On February 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 7274a
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in senate
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.349
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to local government
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.504
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means