+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 7268a
- Amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor