+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On December 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed Memo.282
On November 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1342
- Substituted For S6424a
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.275
- Rules Report Cal.275
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7265a
- Amend And Recommit To Governmental Operations
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On April 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Vote
June 20, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor