+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to environmental conservation
On February 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Passed assembly
- Delivered to senate
On January 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 7250b
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.347
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.449
- Rules report cal.449
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 7250a
- Amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to environmental conservation
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor