+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5635a
- Rules Report Cal.341
- Reported
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7229a
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On April 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor