+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On September 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.265
On September 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S4858
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.388
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
May 27, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor