+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.913
On May 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7211a
- Amend And Recommit To Real Property Taxation
On April 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation