+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On November 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.21
- Signed Chap.419
On November 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1145
- Substituted For S4741
- Referred To Rules
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.155
- Rules Report Cal.155
- Reported
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
June 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor