+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5599
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.396
- Rules Report Cal.396
- Reported
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On April 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor