+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On May 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 7188a
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.272
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.386
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor