+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.254
On July 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1422
- Substituted For S7057
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.224
- Rules Report Cal.224
- Reported
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
+ − Vote
June 3, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor