+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On February 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Opinion referred to judiciary
On January 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- To attorney-general for opinion
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental operations
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Opinion referred to judiciary
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To attorney-general for opinion
On May 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental operations
+ − Sponsors (87)
Type:
Primary Sponsor