+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.258
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.161
- Rules Report Cal.161
- Reported
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor