+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.485
On November 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.673
- Substituted for s4964
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to higher education
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.433
On May 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to higher education
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor