+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed Memo.236
On November 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S5091
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.334
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Vote
June 15, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor