+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Home rule request
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.348
- Rules report cal.348
- Reported
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On January 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 7134a
- Amend and recommit to ways and means
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in senate
- Returned to assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Home rule request
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.248
- Rules report cal.248
- Reported
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor