+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.280
- Delivered To Governor
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.955
- Substituted For S5095
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.542
- Reported
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Economic Development
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Vote
June 12, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor