+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S4949a
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.386
- Rules Report Cal.386
- Reported
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7129a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor