+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to judiciary
On February 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.340
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to judiciary
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.339
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor