+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On July 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.34
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.233
- Rules Report Cal.233
- Reported
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 710a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On January 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor