+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5305b
- Rules Report Cal.597
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7064c
- Amend And Recommit To Local Governments
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7064b
- Amend And Recommit To Local Governments
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7064a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Governments
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor