+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.482
On November 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1016
- Substituted for s3790a
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to judiciary
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.337
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to judiciary
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor