+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.335
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.444
- Rules report cal.444
- Reported
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On May 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to consumer affairs and protection
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor