+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.56
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.71
- Rules Report Cal.71
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor