+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.262
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.35
- Rules Report Cal.35
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On April 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor