+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.330
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.696
- Rules report cal.696
- Reported
- Reported referred to rules
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 6995a
- Amend (t) and recommit to education
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to education
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor