+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.444
On November 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S250b
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.263
- Rules Report Cal.263
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Rules 6990b
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6990a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Vote
June 16, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor