+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.15
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S4801
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.217
- Reported
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Tourism, Parks, Arts And Sports Development
+ − Vote
May 5, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3