+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.26
On June 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S4148
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.435
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Vote
June 10, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor