+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.180
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.132
- Substituted For S5924c
On March 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.63
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.63
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6938b
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On May 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6938a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Higher Education
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Vote
March 31, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 19
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor