+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5288
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.548
- Rules Report Cal.548
- Reported
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On April 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation