+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S4812b
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.382
- Rules Report Cal.382
- Reported
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6916b
- Amend And Recommit To Economic Development
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6916a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Economic Development
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor