+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Committed to insurance
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.324
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to insurance
On June 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.425
- Reported
On April 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to insurance
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor