+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.24
- Signed Chap.568
On December 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S5283a
- Committed To Rules
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Repassed Assembly
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Recalled From Senate
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 6902b
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.502
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6902a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Ways And Means
On April 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
+ − Vote
June 15, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor