+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.606
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to election law
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.272
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to election law