+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On November 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.481
On November 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1610
- Substituted for s5083
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to insurance
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.143
- Rules report cal.143
- Reported
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to insurance
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor