+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
On April 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor