+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 6816c
- Amend and recommit to education
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to education
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 6816b
- Amend (t) and recommit to codes
- Print number 6816b
- Amend (t) and recommit to codes
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 6816a
- Amend and recommit to education
On April 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to education
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor