+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On May 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.506
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On December 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Rules 6806a
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On April 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor