+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.361
On November 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1543
- Substituted For S3137a
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.993
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6761a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On March 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
June 6, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor