+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 6755c
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.301
- Rules Report Cal.301
- Reported
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6755b
- Amend And Recommit To Housing
On March 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6755a
- Amend And Recommit To Housing
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On March 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor