+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5576c
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.377
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6750b
- Amend And Recommit To Education
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6750a
- Amend And Recommit To Education
On March 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor