+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On March 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor