+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6357
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.217
- Rules Report Cal.217
- Reported
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor