+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.349
On September 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1444
- Substituted for s4777d
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed assembly
- Delivered to senate
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 6692c
- Amended on third reading 6692c
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 6692b
- Amended on third reading 6692b
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.483
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 6692a
- Amend and recommit to ways and means
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (140)
Type:
Primary Sponsor